open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:19-00323-13
    Party Name:Jade C. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Minute Entry - Confirmation Granted]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Report on Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Notice of Tardily Filed Claim]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Personal Financial Management Certification]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Report on Conclusion of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Financial Case Analysis]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Certification of Service of Trustee's Private Noticing Center]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Wage Directive]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Notice of Stay]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Statement of Witness]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Ch 13 - Chapter 7 Liquidation Analysis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Declaration Regarding Payments (LBR 1007-1)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Ch 13 - Plan Funding Analysis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Ch 13 - Plan Payment Declaration]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Ch 13 - Certificate Re Payments and Disbursements]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Statement of Social Security Number (will only be viewable by the court, trustee, USTR)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brunner, Daniel H. [Ch 13 - Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204698
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =