Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:19-10458-
    Party Name:Herbert Wayne Rempel and Gloria Louise Rempel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Chapter 7 Trustee's Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Certificate of Financial Management Course for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Certificate of Financial Management Course for Debtor]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Joint Debtor]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [341 Notice Prepare]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Creditors Uploaded]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual No Asset]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Social Security Number(s) Statement - PDF viewable by court only]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (OTC)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Klein, Michael P [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?659676
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =