Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cv-05111
    Party Name:Tellier v. General Dynamics Corporation et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [3 - Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Party]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Verification of State Court Records]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (non motion)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?269456
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =