open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Washington
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00167
    Party Name:Stone v. Aspen Dental Management Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference Notice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.waed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85884
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =