open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cv-05423
    Party Name:Bjorkman v. American Casualty Company of Reading Pennsylvania Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Calendar]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent Letter & Form]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Filer]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration (non motion)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?273261
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =