open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00279-2
    Party Name:USA v. Hernandez-Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulated Motion]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time-Other]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Passport]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appearance Bond]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Invocation of Rights at Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender (text only event)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?266838
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =