open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00905
    Party Name:Orji v. SCORE Correctional Facility et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order (Unsigned)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [IFP Deficiency Letter]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Document(s)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?274253
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =