open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cv-05632
    Party Name:DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Feathercap Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?275338
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =