open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cr-05249-1
    Party Name:USA v. Napoleon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Sentencing Procedure]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?274010
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =