open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington

WASHINGTON PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Washington
    Case Number:3:19-cr-05334-1
    Party Name:USA vs Stickles
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Continuing Trial Date]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Continue Trial]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Disposition of Count - Judgment (no document)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Failure to Appear-Summons Issued (Tacoma)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Misdemeanor CVB]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Citation Issued (Attachment limited to Case Participants)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set Hearings (no document)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?276690
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =