open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:96-cr-00033-1
    Party Name:USA v. Keener
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver Of Right]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervision]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?120933
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =