open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00155
    Party Name:Bartley v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Appealability]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45434
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =