Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00036
    Party Name:Fox et al v. Kleski et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmitted Certified Copy]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Extending Time]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted (Proposed)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Fee Received]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement Of Visiting Attorney]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225783
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =