Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00035
    Party Name:United States of America v. $18,910 United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Issuance of Warrant In Rem]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet Attached]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Of Arrest And Notice In Rem Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Warrant Of Arrest And Notice In Rem Submitted]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint For Forfeiture]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225782
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =