open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00174
    Party Name:Herc Services,LLC v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Public Motion]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?46473
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =