open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00446
    Party Name:Brown v. Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Findings and Recommendations By Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum In Support]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Records]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Extend Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time To File Answer]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?226948
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =