open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00511
    Party Name:International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 132 Pension Fund v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted (Proposed)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227181
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =