open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-bk-00586
    Party Name:Ram Narayanan and Jaya Narayanan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Final Decree and Case Closed (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Case Closed]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Amended Schedules No Fee Required]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [none]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?75742
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =