open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-bk-00585
    Party Name:Rhonda Leigh Lantz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Final Decree and Case Closed (Auto)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Case Closed]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Hearing Set (Reaffirmation Agreement)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Set Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Notice to File Official Form 23]
    Date Published:September 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Reaffirmation Agreement (pro se)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Generic Notice (COURT USER)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Redeem]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [none]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fluharty, Thomas H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?75741
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =