open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-bk-30311
    Party Name:Elizabeth Brooke Quentrill
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Status of Installment Payments]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Financial Management Course (Debtor Education)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Auto Docketed Receipt]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Request for Notices Under BR 2002(g)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?121581
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =