open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00137
    Party Name:Kuykendall et al v. Miller Transporting, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Papers]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?46866
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =