open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00526
    Party Name:Teeters v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Extend Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time To File Document]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief In Supp Of Judgment On The Pleadings In A Soc Sec Case - USE ONLY IF NO MOTION IS BEING FILED]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Transcript]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed In A Social Security Case]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response To Court Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227217
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =