open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-bk-20347
    Party Name:Jackie Lee Frazier
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Discharging Debtor (Batch)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Auto Docketed Receipt]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Status of Installment Payments]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johns, Robert L. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Missing Documents (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (IFP)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?121718
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =