open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00157
    Party Name:Burge v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bifurcate]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Papers]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Other Document]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47015
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =