open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00241
    Party Name:Hamilton et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47012
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =