open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00591
    Party Name:R. E. et al v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Confirmation Re Opening of Transferred Case]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MDL Notification re: CTO]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Stay Pending MDL Transfer]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Pending MDL Transfer]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227430
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =