Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00032
    Party Name:Lust, Minnie v. Kohn Law Firm, S.C. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Support]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standard Attachments Sent]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Judge for Shell Case Opening]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43192
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =