open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00029
    Party Name:Bender, Joseph et al v. State of Wisconsin et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Reply]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Opposition]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Pretrial or Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Support]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit (not related to a motion)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standard Attachments Sent]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Judge for Shell Case Opening]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43189
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =