open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:19-20303-bhl
    Party Name:Shalia Denise Satterwhite
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Objection]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Relief from Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Trustee's Recommendation for Confirmation and Proposed Order on Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Add Non-Filing Spouse]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Order to Pay Wages]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Notice of Debtors Prior Filing (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Ch 13 Form 122C-1)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?415324
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =