Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:19-20304-beh
    Party Name:Diana M Doleman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Order for Proposed Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filing (Active Event)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Whitten, Titania D. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?415325
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =