open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00871
    Party Name:Coly et al v. Alltran Financial LP et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86063
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =