open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:17-cv-01133
    Party Name:Evans v. Douglas et al.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attachments]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?78256
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =