open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00864
    Party Name:Katz et al v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Stayed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Only Order]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86051
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =