open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00869
    Party Name:Diener v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [DEJ Reassignment Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Briefing Letter]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Complaint and Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86059
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =