open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01160
    Party Name:Ruenger v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [DEJ Reassignment Notice]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Briefing Letter]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Complaint and Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Social Security]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86722
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =