open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01159
    Party Name:Williams v. Ellefson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (Non-Motion)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Substitute Parties]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Party]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by DOJ]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Prisoner]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86721
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =