open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01157
    Party Name:Hoke v. Wisconsin Dane County Child Support Agency et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Se Cover Letter]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [DEJ Reassignment Notice]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Pro Se]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86720
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =