open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01314
    Party Name:Jordan v. Eckstein et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Partial Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint - Prisoner]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?87017
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =