open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00748
    Party Name:United States of America v. Shilts, Edward et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standard Attachments Sent]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Judge for Shell Case Opening]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lis Pendens]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44426
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =