open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3-20-12058-cjf
    Party Name:Robert Jansma
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution, NO FUNDS]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Trustee 341 Filings)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Re: Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Notice (1st) re: Financial Management Course (Chapter 7/13) (auto form)(batch)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Employee Income Records (Debtors Payment Advices)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7-Indivdual/NoAsset]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 - Case Upload]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Form 122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?187565
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =