open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00117-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hinckley
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Grand Jury Transcripts]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe for Summons]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Examination]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond Report]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance on Complaint - No JS2]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Speedy Trial - Location Start]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wyd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49248
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =