open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

WYOMING PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00116-1
    Party Name:USA v. Runyon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prosecutor's Statement]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Grand Jury Transcripts]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Temporary Detention]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Memo]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe for Warrant]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wyd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49246
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =