U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-00670
  • Case Name: Hall v. Higher One Machines, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Fairness Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Remark]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [1 Fox Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 26, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 26, 2016: [Settlement]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Expedite]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 21, 2016: [Settlement]
  • July 20, 2016: [Settlement]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 20, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 26, 2016: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 25, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 05, 2016: [Certify Class]
  • February 05, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 05, 2016: [Motion Referred]
  • February 05, 2016: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • February 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Case Selected for Mediation]
  • January 11, 2016: [Document]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2015: [Complaint]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance for Non-District Counsel]
  • December 28, 2015: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.