U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-17856-
  • Case Name: Jennifer Eileen Ptacek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Close Bankruptcy Case-Auto Docket]
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Trustee Fee Paid]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge]
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Discharge-Auto Docket]
  • November 22, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 7 - Final)]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 09, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 7)]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Claimant's Notice Request]
  • July 21, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • July 17, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 17, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 15, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Set UST Statement of Abuse and Financial Course Due Date]
  • July 14, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Connolly, Tom H. [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.