U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

florida Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Florida
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:14-bk-03933-
  • Case Name: Peter N. Sotis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond & Closing Estate (incl. Conditional)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [TRUSTEE - Final Account - Chapter 7 Asset (batch)]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Proof of Service]
  • October 21, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Order Allowing Administrative Expenses (and Directing Disbursement of Funds)]
  • October 12, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Approved Notice of Final Report - Chapter 7 Asset Closing]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Notice Of Final Report of Trustee and Applications for Compensation (NFR) - Effective April 1, 2009]
  • September 09, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Final Report - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • September 09, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)]
  • September 09, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Report of Sale]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)]
  • August 15, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Report of Sale]
  • August 12, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Proof of Service]
  • August 11, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Compensation]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Proof of Service]
  • April 25, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Compensation]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit)]
January, 2016
  • January 17, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 15, 2016: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Proof of Service]
  • December 16, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Order on Application to Employ/Retain (BK)]
  • December 16, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Application to Employ/Retain]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Proof of Service]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Administrative Expenses]
  • November 16, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Certificate Of Service]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rivera, Luis E [Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.