U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8-11-72155-ast
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Scott Littwin and Alicia Ann Delano
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 16, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Final Decree Ch 12/13]
  • June 14, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
April, 2016
  • April 16, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Order of Discharge]
  • April 14, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Discharging Debtor Chapter 13]
  • April 12, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Trustee's Certification of Completed Plan (batch)]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Chapter 13 Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q)]
  • January 03, 2016: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Debtor's Certification About a Financial Management Course and/or Form 423]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: bk Office: 8 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeRosa, Marianne [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (B10 Supplement 1)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.