U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-07826
  • Case Name: State of New York ex rel. Eric Rasmusen v. Citigroup, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Case Remanded Out - State Court]
  • December 02, 2016: [Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk]
  • December 02, 2016: [Memorandum & Opinion]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Letter]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2016: [Declaration in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2016: [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2015: [Stipulation and Order]
  • October 07, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2015: [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.