U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-51996-amk
  • Case Name: Ralph Roebuck, Jr. and Nadine Roebuck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Notice of Order to Avoid Lien]
  • February 24, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Avoid Lien (PDF)]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Notice of Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Avoid Lien]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [ADI Returned Mail]
  • December 10, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Notice of Discharge of Debtor]
  • December 08, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Automatic Discharge of Debtor for Judge Koschik]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Notice of Motion]
  • October 19, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Avoid Lien]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Financial Management Course (Form 23)]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 19, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [ADI Notice of Chapter 7 341(a) Meeting of Creditors & Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • August 14, 2015: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gertz, Marc P [Employee Income Records]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.