U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-bk-31224
  • Case Name: Sheldon Bruce Rish
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
  • October 19, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Relief from Stay]
  • October 04, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Abandonment]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Relief from Stay]
  • September 16, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 09, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
  • September 06, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Discharge of Debtor]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Financial Management Course]
  • August 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
  • August 16, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Notice of Deficient Filing]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
  • June 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Agreed Relief from Stay]
  • June 16, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Abandonment]
  • June 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Notification of Deficiency]
  • June 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • June 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • June 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Amended Schedules]
  • June 09, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
  • May 02, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2016
  • April 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
  • April 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Statement of Intent]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Harker, Donald F [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
  • April 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.