U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-33736-rld7
  • Case Name: Joseph Adam McCullar
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Trustee's Final Account [UST Form 101-7-TDR]]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Distribution]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Chapter 07 Trustee's Final Report]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • November 03, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Discharging Debtor(s) - DN7]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Inventory and Report of Assets]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Camacho, Rodolfo A [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.